CameraIcon
CameraIcon
SearchIcon
MyQuestionIcon


Question

212×424+212×366+212×240

Explain With Solution


Solution

Given expression is 

212×424+212×366+212×240

We know A*(B+C+D) = AB + AC + AD Apply this property

Put A = 212 ,B = 424,C = 366 and D = 240 

So we can write

212×424+212×366+212×240

= 212 x (424+366+240)      add (424+366+240) = 1030 

= 212 x ( 1030)

Multiply 212 and 1030 

On multiplication we will get 

= 218360 

Answer :

212×424+212×366+212×240 =  218360 


 

flag
 Suggest corrections
thumbs-up
 
0 Upvotes


Similar questions
View More



footer-image