CameraIcon
CameraIcon
SearchIcon
MyQuestionIcon
MyQuestionIcon
Question

Name the property of multiplication illustrated by each of the following statements :

(i) 158×127=127×158

(ii) (23×79)×95=23×(79×95)

(iii) 34×(34×56)+(34×78)

(iv) 169×1=1×169=169

(v) 1115×1511=1511×1115=1

(vi) 75×0=0