 # Maths Tricks

Maths tricks are the ways to solve complex mathematical problems easily and quickly. Mathematics is not only limited to learning from textbooks, there are different learning styles that make mathematics easier. Simple Maths magic tricks help us with fast calculations and improve our mathematical skills. For example, the multiplication tricks will help students to learn maths tables and quick multiplication.

Maths is not easy for some students. The Maths tricks are not only helpful for school-going kids but also supports you to manage time in final exams as well as in the competitive exam and solve the Maths questions with accuracy. These tricks are very helpful for Class 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 students.

## Learning Quick Maths Tricks

Mathematical tricks are the best way to make Maths a fun subject. Therefore, learning simple Maths tricks will help the students to gain their confidence and enhance problem-solving skills. With these learning skills, they can achieve a big success in the competitive exams and upcoming future.

## 16 Maths Tricks (With Examples)

Imagine how mathematics would be easy and interesting when you have the ability to calculate the problems in a matter of seconds using some Maths tricks. There are different kinds of arithmetic operations like addition, subtraction, division, multiplication, squaring, roots, powers, logarithms, divisions, etc. Here are some of the best tricks, which will help students to perform arithmetic calculations easily.

### 1. Maths Tricks for Addition

With the help of basic principles of tens and unit places, the addition of two-digit numbers is performed by

• Take 43 + 34
• Split the second number into tens and unit places. 34 = 30 + 4
• Finish the ten’s addition. 43 + 30 = 73
• Finally, add the remaining unit place digit. 73 + 4 = 77.

### 2. Maths Tricks for Subtraction

Here is an example that requires a lot of borrowing

• Consider two numbers say 1000 and 676
• Subtract 1 from both the numbers; we get 999 and 675
• Then subtract 675 from 999, we get 324
• So, 1000 – 676 = 324.

### 3. Quick Multiplication Tricks by Breaking Down Numbers

• Let’s try the numbers 24 and 16
• First split the number 24, which gives 4 x 6
• Then multiply 6 with 16, we get 96
• Finally multiply the number, 96 x 4 = 384
• So, the multiplication of two numbers 24 x 16 gives the solution 384.

### 4. Multiplied By 15

• Consider the multiplication of two numbers say 56 and 15
• Now add zero at the end of the first number, it becomes 560.
• Divide that number by 2; we get 560/2 = 280
• Add the resultant number with 560, so 560 + 280 = 840.
• So the answer for 56 and 15 is 840.

### 5. Multiplication of Two-Digit Numbers

If anyone of the given numbers is an even number, then follow the steps to solve

• Consider an example, 18 x 37
• Here 18 is an even number, then divide the first number in half, so that 18/2 = 9
• Then double the second number. 37 x 2 =74
• Finally, multiply the resultant numbers. It becomes 74 x 9 = 666

### 6. Maths Division Tricks

The numbers that can be evenly divided by certain numbers are:

• If a number is an even number and ends in 0, 2, 4, 6 or 8, it is divided by 2.
• A number is divisible by 3 if the sum of the digits is divisible by 3. Consider the number 12 = 1 + 3 and 3 is divisible by 3.
• A number is divisible by 4 if the last two digits are divisible by 4. Example: 9312. Here the last two digits are 12, and 12 is divisible by 4.
• If the last digit is 0 or 5, it is divisible by 5
• If a number is divisible by 2 and 3, then it is divisible by 6, since 6 is the product of 2 and 3.
• If the number is divisible by 8, the last three digits of the numbers are divisible by 8.
• If a number is divisible by 9, the sum of the digits is divided by 9. Let us consider the example, 4518 = 4 + 5 + 1 + 8 = 18, which is divisible by 9.
• If the final digit of the number is 0, it is divisible by 10.

### 7. Maths Trick to Find Percentage

Let us take; we have to find the percentage of the number 5% of 475, follow the steps.

• For the given number, move the decimal point over by one place. 475 becomes 47.5
• Then divide the number 47.5 by 2, we get 23.75.
• 23.75 is the solution to the given problem.

### 8. Maths Magic tricks to Calculate Squares ending with digit 5

• Let’s consider the number 75 to find its square.
• Start writing the answer of last two digits number that is 25 because any number that ends with 5 is 25
• Take the first digit of the number 75. That is 7 and take the number that follows 7 is 8.
• Now, multiply 7 and 8, we get the number 56.
• Finally, write the number 56 in the prefix and combine with 25 what we already wrote.
• So, the answer is 5625.
• Squares Ending in 5:  n5 = n(n + 1)52 = n(n + 1)25 , where n is the first digit.
• Example: Let’s consider the number 75 to find its square. Here n = 7,

So, 75 = 7(7 + 1)25 = (7 x 8) 25  = 5625.

### 9. Tricks to Multiply by 2 and 4

When a number is multiplied by 2 or 4, then the last digit of the resulting value will be an even number always.

Examples:

• 19 x 2 = 38
• 19 x 4 = 76

### 10. Multiplication by 5

When a number is multiplied by 5, then the resulting value will either end with 0 or 5.

Examples:

• 11 x 5 = 55
• 8 x 5 = 40
• 121 x 5 = 605

### 11. Multiplication by 10

When a number is multiplied by 10, then the resulting value ends with 0 always.

Examples:

• 5 x 10 = 50
• 10 x 10 = 100
• 11 x 10 = 110
• 17 x 10 = 170
• 211 x 10 = 2110

### 12. Tricks to Memorise Table of 9

It is easy to remember the table of 9. Just we need to focus on the pattern.

09, 18, 27, 36, 45, 54, 63, 72, 81, 90

We can see the numbers at the ten’s place are increasing by 1, and the numbers at the unit place are decreasing by 1.

### 13. Trick for Squaring a Two-digit Number

Given number: 57

Here, Tens digit = 5 Unit digit = 7

7 + 57 = 64

64 × 5 = 320

7² = 49

3200 + 49 = 3249

57² = 3249

### 14. Trick for Unit Digit of a Cube Number

Below are the numbers which have the same unit digit for their cubes.

 Number Cube of a Number Unit Digit of Cube 1 13 = 1 1 4 43 = 64 4 5 53 = 125 5 6 63 = 216 6 9 93 =  729 9 10 103 = 1000 10

This will help you in finding the cube root of a number (which is a definite cube).

### 15. Trick for Cube Root of a Number

Let’s consider a number: 117649

To find the cube root of this number, we need to divide the number into parts.

Take the three rightmost digits as one part and the remaining digits as another part.

Part 1: 649

Here, the unit digit is 9, and we know the cube root of this number will contain 9 as its unit digit.

Part 2: 117

Identify the cube of a number which is smaller than 117.

43 = 64 and 53 = 125

Thus, the cube root of 117649 is 49.

Note: This trick will work for finding the cube root of definite cube numbers.

### 16. Trick for Multiplication Table of 15

Here is the trick for writing the 15 times table quickly.

 Multiplication Write 5 and 0 in sequence at unit’s place Write two consecutive odd & even numbers in sequence as shown below Another shortcut for remaining digits in the product (other than unit digit): Write the multiples of 3 alternatively starting from the second product Now perform skip counting by 3 starting from 1 15 × 1 _ 5 15 15 15 × 2 _ 0 30 30 15 × 3 _ 5 45 45 15 × 4 _ 0 60 60 15 × 5 _ 5 75 75 15 × 6 _ 0 90 90 15 × 7 _ 5 105 105 15 × 8 _ 0 120 120 15 × 9 _ 5 135 135 15 × 10 _ 0 150 150

### Conclusion

Maths is a fun subject. Adding tricks to this subject will make it more interesting. Students will be able to solve all the complex problems using these Maths magic tricks. These tricks also help students to improve their problem-solving skills and boost their confidence.

## Maths Tricks Practice Questions

Find more maths tricks questions for practice here.

1. A merchant can place 8 large boxes or 10 small boxes into a carton for shipping. In one shipment, he sent a total of 96 boxes. If there are more large boxes than small boxes, how many cartons did he ship?
(A) 11 (B) 10  (C) 12   (D) 15 (E) 17
2. 339% of 803 + 77.8% of 1107 = ?
(A) 3175 (B) 3320 (C) 3580 (D) 3710 (E) 3950
3. 78.54 ÷ 0.03 + 22.8 ÷ 0.8 – 1470 × 1.25 = ?
(A) 809 (B) 807.5 (C) 805 (D) 802.5 (E) 801
4. The cost of 8 dozen eggs is Rs. 256. Which calculation is needed to find the cost of 9 eggs?
(A) (9 × 256) × (8 ÷ 12)
(B) (12 × 256) ÷ (8 × 9)
(C) (8 × 256) ÷ (9 × 12)
(D) (9 × 256) × (8 × 12)
(E) (9 × 256) ÷ (8 × 12)

## Maths Tricks Related Articles

For more math tips and tricks, to solve the complicated sum in a matter of seconds, register with BYJU’S – The Learning App and watch the interactive videos.

## Frequently Asked Questions on Maths Tricks

Q1

### What is the use of maths tricks?

Maths tricks help us to do the calculation fast. It saves time and increases the chances of scoring more marks in the exams.
Q2

### What are multiplication tricks?

The multiplication tricks are used to solve multiplication problems quickly and accurately. If we are able to memorize multiplication tables, then we can easily solve the questions based on them.
Q3

### How to add in a faster way?

To add any two numbers in a faster way, follow the below steps:
Firstly, round up both the numbers by adding or subtracting small numbers.
Now subtract or add those values to get the final result.
For example, Add 799 and 299.
Round up 799 to 799+1 = 800 and 299 to 299+1 = 300
800+300 = 1100
Now subtract the added numbers from 1100,
1100-1-1 = 1100-2 = 1099
Q4

### How to multiply quickly?

We can split the numbers and then multiply them. For example, multiply 81 and 24.
Splitting the number 81 = 80 + 1
The given multiplication can be written as (80 + 1) × 24 = (80 × 24) + (24 × 1)
Now, 24 × 80 = 1920 and 24 × 1 = 24
Add both the numbers 1920 + 24 = 1944
∴ 81 × 24 = 1944
Q5

### How to find if a number is divisible by 9?

If a number is divisible by 9, the sum of the digits is divided by 9. Let us consider the example, 1728 = 1+ 7+2+8=18, which is divisible by 9.
Q6

### How to find if a number is divisible by 13?

If a number N is given, then multiply the last digit of N with 4 and add it to the rest truncate of the number. If the outcome is divisible by 13, then the number N is also divisible by 13.
For example, 650 is divisible by 13 because;
65+0*4=65
65 is divisible by 13
Q7

### How to multiply 5 with an even number?

Assume that, 5 should be multiplied by 48. Follow the below steps to find the product value.
Step 1: Divide the given even number by 2. Hence, 48 divided by 2 is 24.
Step 2: Add zero to the result, obtained in step 1 to get the product value. So, we get 240.
Therefore, the product of 5 and 48 is 240.

Q8

### How to multiply 5 with an odd number?

Let us consider an example, 5 × 25. Here, 25 is an odd number. Go through the below steps to find the product.
Step 1: Subtract 1 from the odd number (i.e. the number that is being multiplied by 5). So, 25 – 1 = 24.
Step 2: Half the number that is obtained in step 1. Hence, 24/2 = 12.
Step 3: Keep the number 5 in unit digits and append the result obtained in step 2. Hence, we get 125.
So, we get 5 × 25 is 125.